AK SB17 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing the University of Alaska to establish, through an agreement with the University of Hawaii, the Ted Stevens - Daniel K. Inouye Exchange Program for political science students at the University of Alaska and the University of Hawaii to commemorate the bipartisan friendship between Senator Ted Stevens and Senator Daniel K. Inouye.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stevens/inouye University Exchange Prog.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2017-03-15SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER EDC
2017-03-13SenateFN1: INDETERMINATE(UA)
2017-03-13SenateNR: GIESSEL, COGHILL
2017-03-13SenateDP: HUGHES, BEGICH
2017-03-13SenateEDC RPT 2DP 2NR
2017-03-10SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, HUGHES
2017-01-18SenateCOSPONSOR(S): STEVENS, BISHOP
2017-01-18SenateEDC
2017-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback