AK SB169 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the definition of 'direct supervision' for purposes of medical assistance coverage of behavioral health clinic services.
Title
Medicaid: Behavioral Health Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-05-04 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2018-05-04 | House | VERSION: CSSB 169(RLS) |
2018-05-04 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-04 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2018-05-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 169(RLS) |
2018-05-03 | House | ADJOURNED TO 5/4 CALENDAR |
2018-05-02 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA |
2018-05-02 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CALENDAR |
2018-05-02 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-02 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-04-04 | House | NR: KITO, EASTMAN |
2018-04-04 | House | DP: TARR, ZULKOSKY, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SPOHNHOLZ |
2018-04-04 | House | HSS RPT 4DP 2NR |
2018-03-29 | House | HSS |
2018-03-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-03-26 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 169(RLS) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 169(RLS) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-03-26 | Senate | RLS CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-03-26 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-03-26 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | DP: MEYER, MICCICHE, GARDNER, MACKINNON, KELLY |
2018-03-26 | Senate | RLS RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE |
2018-03-21 | Senate | RULES WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | DP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, GIESSEL |
2018-03-12 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE |
2018-01-31 | Senate | HSS |
2018-01-31 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |