AK SB169 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing in the Department of Health and Social Services a statewide immunization program and the State Vaccine Assessment Council; creating a vaccine assessment account; requiring a vaccine assessment from assessable entities and other program participants for statewide immunization purchases; repealing the temporary child and adult immunization program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Immunization Program; Vaccine Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 169(FIN)? Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 30 SLA 14 |
2014-06-13 | Senate | 12:00 PM 6/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-15 | House | FN11: (DHS) |
2014-05-15 | House | FN10: (DHS) |
2014-05-15 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266 |
2014-05-15 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-19 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2014-04-19 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-18 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 169(HSS) |
2014-04-18 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-18 | House | HOLMES, SADDLER, PRUITT |
2014-04-18 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, GUTTENBERG, KAWASAKI, LEDOUX, OLSON, SEATON, |
2014-04-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-18 | House | PASSED Y39 A1 |
2014-04-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 169(HSS) |
2014-04-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-18 | House | HSS HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-18 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE |
2014-04-16 | House | FN11: (DHS) |
2014-04-16 | House | FN10: (DHS) |
2014-04-16 | House | FN9: INDETERMINATE(DHS) |
2014-04-16 | House | FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2014-04-16 | House | FN4: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-16 | House | NR: GARA |
2014-04-16 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, MUNOZ, EDGMON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, THOMPSON, HOLMES, STOLTZE |
2014-04-16 | House | FIN RPT HCS(HSS) 8DP 1NR |
2014-04-15 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA |
2014-04-09 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO |
2014-04-09 | House | FN8: INDETERMINATE(DHS) |
2014-04-09 | House | FN7: (DHS) |
2014-04-09 | House | FN6: (DHS) |
2014-04-09 | House | FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2014-04-09 | House | FN4: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-09 | House | NR: REINBOLD, PRUITT, KELLER |
2014-04-09 | House | DP: SEATON, HIGGINS |
2014-04-09 | House | HSS RPT HCS(HSS) 2DP 3NR |
2014-04-01 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES |
2014-03-24 | House | HSS, FIN |
2014-03-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-21 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 169(FIN) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-03-21 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 169(FIN) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-21 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-21 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-19 | Senate | HELD TO 3/21 CALENDAR |
2014-03-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN8: INDETERMINATE(DHS) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN7: (DHS) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN6: (DHS) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(CED) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | DP: MEYER, KELLY, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER HSS |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(CED) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FN3: (DHS) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FN1: (DHS) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, MEYER, ELLIS |
2014-02-24 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2014-02-10 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH |
2014-02-10 | Senate | HSS |
2014-02-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |