AK SB166 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to nursing and to the Board of Nursing.
Title
Board Of Nursing; Nurses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/14 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 29 SLA 14 |
2014-06-13 | Senate | 12:00 PM 6/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-27 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) - SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE |
2014-04-19 | Senate | ADOPTED LEGISLATIVE LETTER OF INTENT |
2014-04-18 | House | VERSION: CSSB 166(FIN) |
2014-04-18 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-18 | House | ADOPTED HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT - UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-18 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2014-04-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 166(FIN) |
2014-04-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-18 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-16 | House | NR: HERRON, JOSEPHSON |
2014-04-16 | House | DP: SADDLER, OLSON |
2014-04-16 | House | L&C RPT 2DP 2NR |
2014-04-03 | House | L&C |
2014-04-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-02 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 166(FIN) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 166(FIN) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-02 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-02 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-02 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2014-03-28 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MEYER, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH |
2014-03-28 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2014-03-14 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C |
2014-03-14 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(LWF) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | NR: ELLIS, STEDMAN, OLSON |
2014-03-14 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE |
2014-03-14 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2014-02-07 | Senate | L&C |
2014-02-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Civil Procedure
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Licensing
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses
Civil Procedure
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Licensing
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses