AK SB163 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/26/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/26/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the duties of the commissioner of labor and workforce development and the Fishermen's Fund Advisory and Appeals Council with respect to the fishermen's fund and increasing the allowances for injury, disability, or heart attack payable from the fund, and allowing a vessel owner to recover a portion of the deductible under a protection and indemnity insurance policy following a claim by an injured fisherman; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fishermen's Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/26/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 103 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:50 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-14 | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 26 | |
2010-04-14 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-14 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- | |
2010-04-14 | TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-13 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD | |
2010-04-12 | VERSION: HCS SB 163(RLS) | |
2010-04-12 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-12 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, THOMAS, MUNOZ, GARA, PETERSEN, TUCK | |
2010-04-12 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-12 | PASSED Y37 A3 | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 163(RLS) | |
2010-04-12 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-12 | RLS HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2010 | |
2010-04-10 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD | |
2010-04-09 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA | |
2010-04-09 | FN3: ZERO(DFG) | |
2010-04-09 | FN2: (LWF) | |
2010-04-09 | NR: GARDNER | |
2010-04-09 | DP: KERTTULA, OLSON, HERRON, NEUMAN, DAHLSTROM | |
2010-04-09 | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 26 | |
2010-04-09 | RLS RPT HCS(RLS) NT 5DP 1NR | |
2010-04-05 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): P.WILSON | |
2010-03-17 | (HB 207 COMPANION BILL) | |
2010-03-17 | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED | |
2010-03-17 | FIN | |
2010-03-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-15 | VERSION: SB 163 | |
2010-03-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-03-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-03-15 | PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1 | |
2010-03-15 | THOMAS | |
2010-03-15 | COSPONSOR(S): MENARD, KOOKESH, STEDMAN, MEYER, MCGUIRE, EGAN, WIELECHOWSKI, | |
2010-03-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 163 | |
2010-03-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | FN3: ZERO(DFG) | |
2010-02-24 | FN2: (LWF) | |
2010-02-24 | AM: OLSON | |
2010-02-24 | NR: HOFFMAN | |
2010-02-24 | DP: STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-02-24 | FIN RPT 5DP 1NR 1AM | |
2009-04-03 | COSPONSOR(S): WAGONER, DYSON, STEVENS | |
2009-04-03 | FN1: (LWF) | |
2009-04-03 | DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS, BUNDE, DAVIS | |
2009-04-03 | L&C RPT 5DP | |
2009-03-25 | L&C, FIN | |
2009-03-25 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |