AK SB162 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing a licensed optometrist to prescribe a pharmaceutical agent containing hydrocodone.
Title
Hydrocodone Prescription By Optometrists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - House: SB 162 Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/14 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 35 SLA 14 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 10:30 AM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-13 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) - SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE |
2014-04-17 | House | VERSION: SB 162 |
2014-04-17 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2014-04-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 162 |
2014-04-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-11 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-11 | House | NR: REINBOLD, PRUITT, KELLER |
2014-04-11 | House | DP: SEATON, HIGGINS |
2014-04-11 | House | HSS RPT 2DP 3NR |
2014-03-25 | House | HSS |
2014-03-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-24 | Senate | VERSION: SB 162 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 162 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-24 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-24 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, ELLIS |
2014-02-24 | Senate | DP: MEYER |
2014-02-24 | Senate | HSS RPT 1DP 3NR |
2014-02-07 | Senate | HSS |
2014-02-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |