AK SB160 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making and amending appropriations, including capital appropriations, supplemental appropriations, and other appropriations; making appropriations to capitalize funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Budget: Capital
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2012-05-15 | PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS | |
2012-05-15 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/14 CHAPTER 17 SLA 12 | |
2012-05-03 | 11:46 AM 5/3/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-27 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2012-04-18 | ENGROSSED AND RETURNED TO SENATE | |
2012-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-15 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1 | |
2012-04-15 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: HCS CSSB 160(FIN) AM H | |
2012-04-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2012-04-15 | ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B) | |
2012-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y37 N2 V1 | |
2012-04-15 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2012-04-15 | AM NO 4 FAILED Y11 N27 A1 V1 | |
2012-04-15 | AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED | |
2012-04-15 | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-15 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y12 N27 V1 | |
2012-04-15 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 & ALL AMS UC | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 160(FIN) | |
2012-04-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR | |
2012-04-14 | FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-14 | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/14/12 | |
2012-04-14 | AM: GUTTENBERG | |
2012-04-14 | NR: GARA | |
2012-04-14 | DNP: DOOGAN | |
2012-04-14 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, JOULE, NEUMAN, EDGMON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2012-04-14 | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 8DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM | |
2012-04-12 | FIN | |
2012-04-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-04-12 | VERSION: CSSB 160(FIN) | |
2012-04-12 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2012-04-11 | ENGROSSED | |
2012-04-11 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-11 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N- | |
2012-04-11 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-11 | MEYER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2012-04-11 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-11 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2012-04-11 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 160(FIN) | |
2012-04-11 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-11 | AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N15 A1 | |
2012-04-11 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y4 N16 | |
2012-04-11 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-11 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-11 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | AM: OLSON | |
2012-04-11 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, ELLIS | |
2012-04-11 | FIN RPT CS 6DP 1AM NEW TITLE | |
2012-01-17 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2012-01-17 | FIN | |
2012-01-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |