AK SB16 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcohol Lic: Recreational Sites; Bonds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol Lic: Recreational Sites; Bonds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 16(FIN) Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2019-07-10SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 7/5 CHAPTER 10 SLA 19
2019-07-08SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2019-07-08Senate9:53 AM 7/01/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-15SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-15SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N2 A1
2019-05-15SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2019-05-15HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 16(FIN) AM H
2019-05-15HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2019-05-15HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, DRUMMOND, TUCK
2019-05-15HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-15HousePASSED Y37 E1 A2
2019-05-15HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 16(FIN) AM H
2019-05-15HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-15HouseAM NO 5 ADOPTED Y27 N10 E1 A2
2019-05-15HouseAM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
2019-05-15HouseAM NO 3 ADOPTED Y22 N15 E1 A2
2019-05-15HouseAM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
2019-05-15HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2019-05-15HouseFIN HCS ADOPTED UC
2019-05-15HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-15HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2019
2019-05-15HouseFN3: (CED)
2019-05-15HouseFN2: ZERO(REV)
2019-05-15HouseNR: LEBON
2019-05-15HouseORTIZ, WILSON
2019-05-15HouseDP: JOHNSTON, CARPENTER, TILTON, KNOPP, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD,
2019-05-15HouseFIN RPT HCS(FIN) 9DP 1NR
2019-05-13HouseFN3: (CED)
2019-05-13HouseFN2: ZERO(REV)
2019-05-13HouseAM: TALERICO
2019-05-13HouseNR: FIELDS
2019-05-13HouseDP: HANNAN, REVAK, STORY, STUTES, WOOL
2019-05-13HouseL&C RPT HCS(L&C) 5DP 1NR 1AM
2019-04-09HouseL&C, FIN
2019-04-09HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-04-08SenateVERSION: CSSB 16(FIN)
2019-04-08SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2019-04-08SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-04-08SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2019-04-08SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEDMAN
2019-04-08SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 16(FIN)
2019-04-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-04-08SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2019-04-08SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-08SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2019
2019-04-05SenateFN3: (CED)
2019-04-01SenateFN2: ZERO(REV)
2019-04-01SenateNR: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, SHOWER, OLSON
2019-04-01SenateDP: VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, WILSON
2019-04-01SenateFIN RPT CS 3DP 4NR NEW TITLE
2019-03-08SenateCOSPONSOR(S): SHOWER, KIEHL, BIRCH, BISHOP, REINBOLD, STEVENS
2019-02-25SenateFN2: ZERO(REV)
2019-02-25SenateFN1: (CED)
2019-02-25SenateDP: REINBOLD, BIRCH, BISHOP, COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON
2019-02-25SenateL&C RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
2019-02-08SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, WILSON
2019-01-16SenateL&C, FIN
2019-01-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-01-16SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/11/19

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=SB16
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016E.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016F.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016C.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016D.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016E.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SB0016Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=SB16&Page=00755#0755
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=SB16&Page=01063#1063
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=SB16&Page=01065#1065
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=SB16&Page=01066#1066
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=SB16&Page=01205#1205

Bill Comments

feedback