AK SB159 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/16/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to medical and rehabilitation information in workers' compensation matters; increasing the maximum funeral expenses payable as a workers' compensation death benefit; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Comp: Funeral Expenses/med Info

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-09 EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/16/10
2010-07-09 SIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 77 SLA 10
2010-07-09 2:50 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2010-04-18 EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2010-04-18 CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2010-04-18 CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2010-04-18 VERSION: SB 159 AM H
2010-04-18 TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2010-04-18 EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2010-04-18 PASSED 35 A5
2010-04-18 AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2010-04-18 TITLE CHANGE: HCR 36
2010-04-18 ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2010-04-18 AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-18 RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-18 READ THE THIRD TIME SB 159
2010-04-18 MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2010-04-18 MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2010-04-18 MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2010-04-17 CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, LYNN
2010-04-17 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/18 CALENDAR
2010-04-17 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-17 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010
2010-04-15 CROSS SPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH
2010-04-15 FN2: ZERO(LWF)
2010-04-15 NR: KELLY, HAWKER
2010-04-15 DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, AUSTERMAN, SALMON, STOLTZE
2010-04-15 FIN RPT 8DP 2NR
2010-04-10 FN2: ZERO(LWF)
2010-04-10 NR: T.WILSON
2010-04-10 DP: CHENAULT, BUCH, OLSON
2010-04-10 L&C RPT 3DP 1NR
2010-03-19 L&C, FIN
2010-03-19 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2010-03-18 VERSION: SB 159
2010-03-18 TRANSMITTED TO (H)
2010-03-18 EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2010-03-18 PASSED Y19 N- E1
2010-03-18 COSPONSOR(S): MENARD, MEYER, MCGUIRE, OLSON, DAVIS
2010-03-18 READ THE THIRD TIME SB 159
2010-03-18 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-03-18 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-03-18 RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2010
2010-02-24 FN2: ZERO(LWF)
2010-02-24 NR: OLSON
2010-02-24 DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS
2010-02-24 FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
2009-04-03 FN1: ZERO(LWF)
2009-04-03 NR: BUNDE
2009-04-03 DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS, DAVIS
2009-04-03 L&C RPT 4DP 1NR
2009-03-20 L&C, FIN
2009-03-20 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback