AK SB158 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to oil and hazardous substances and waiver of cost recovery for containment and cleanup of certain releases; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Oil/hazardous Sub.:cleanup/reimbursement
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SB 158 Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-04-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-17 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2018-04-17 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2018-04-16 | House | VERSION: SB 158 AM H |
2018-04-16 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2018-04-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-16 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40 |
2018-04-16 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-16 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-16 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2018-04-16 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-15 | House | LINCOLN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-04-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-15 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2018-04-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 158 |
2018-04-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR |
2018-04-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018 |
2018-04-13 | House | FN1: (DEC) |
2018-04-13 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2018-04-13 | House | NR: WILSON, PRUITT, ORTIZ, TILTON |
2018-04-13 | House | DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-13 | House | FIN RPT 5DP 4NR 1AM |
2018-03-29 | House | FIN |
2018-03-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-03-26 | Senate | VERSION: SB 158 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-03-26 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 158 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-03-26 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-03-26 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | FN1: (DEC) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-03-12 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-03-12 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR |
2018-02-16 | Senate | FN1: (DEC) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | DP: VON IMHOF |
2018-02-16 | Senate | NR: GIESSEL, WIELECHOWSKI, BISHOP, COGHILL, STEDMAN |
2018-02-16 | Senate | RES RPT 1DP 5NR |
2018-01-24 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2018-01-24 | Senate | FN1: (DEC) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | RES, FIN |
2018-01-24 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |