AK SB152 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing September 11 of each year as Patriot Day; and establishing June 27 of each year as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish: Patriot Day;ptsi Awareness Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SB 152 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 Table (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt HCS SB 152(MLV) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-04-17SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2018-04-17SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2018-04-16HouseVERSION: HCS SB 152(MLV)
2018-04-16HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2018-04-16HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI, KOPP, CHENAULT
2018-04-16HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 27
2018-04-16HousePASSED Y40
2018-04-16HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 152(MLV)
2018-04-16HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-16HouseAM NO 1 TABLED Y21 N16 A3
2018-04-16HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED
2018-04-16HouseMLV HCS ADOPTED Y34 N1 A5
2018-04-16HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-16HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2018
2018-04-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
2018-03-28HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2018-03-28HouseNR: REINBOLD
2018-03-28HouseDP: RAUSCHER, SPOHNHOLZ, SADDLER, PARISH, LEDOUX, TUCK
2018-03-28HousePENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
2018-03-28HouseMLV RPT HCS(MLV) NT 6DP 1NR
2018-02-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2018-02-09HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TILTON, GRENN, TUCK
2018-02-09HouseMLV
2018-02-09HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-02-07SenateVERSION: SB 152
2018-02-07SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-02-07SenatePASSED Y19 N- V1
2018-02-07SenateMACKINNON, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, KELLY
2018-02-07SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, COGHILL, HUGHES, BISHOP, STEDMAN, COSTELLO, GIESSEL
2018-02-07SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 152
2018-02-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-02-07SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-07SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/7/2018
2018-02-02SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2018-02-02SenateNR: EGAN
2018-02-02SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL
2018-02-02SenateSTA RPT 3DP 1NR
2018-01-24SenateSTA
2018-01-24SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback