AK SB15 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-12 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to possession of an electronic smoking product or a product containing nicotine by a minor and to selling or giving a product containing nicotine or an electronic smoking product to a minor; relating to business license endorsements to sell cigarettes, cigars, tobacco, products containing tobacco, electronic smoking products, or products containing nicotine; relating to citations for certain offenses concerning tobacco, products containing nicotine, or electronic smoking products; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

E-cigs/tobacco/nicotine & Minors; Sales

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Advance to Third Reading on the Same Day (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Advance to Third Reading on the Same Day (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 15(FIN) Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-12SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-12SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-12SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
2018-05-12SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2018-05-12HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 15(L&C)
2018-05-12HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2018-05-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, ZULKOSKY, SADDLER, JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI, TUCK
2018-05-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-12HousePASSED Y37 N3
2018-05-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 15(L&C)
2018-05-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y37 N1 A2
2018-05-12HouseL&C HCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-12HouseRULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 5/12/18
2018-04-26HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
2018-04-20HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
2018-04-17HouseFN7: (CED)
2018-04-17HouseFN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2018-04-17HouseAM: WILSON, TILTON
2018-04-17HouseDP: GARA, PRUITT, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON
2018-04-17HouseTECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
2018-04-17HouseFIN RPT HCS(L&C) NT 6DP 2AM
2018-04-02HouseFN7: (CED)
2018-04-02HouseFN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2018-04-02HouseNR: STUTES, WOOL, BIRCH
2018-04-02HouseDP: KITO
2018-04-02HouseTECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
2018-04-02HouseL&C RPT HCS(L&C) NT 1DP 3NR
2018-03-09HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GRENN
2018-03-09HouseL&C, FIN
2018-03-09HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-08SenateVERSION: CSSB 15(FIN)
2018-03-08SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-03-08SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2018-03-08SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 15(FIN)
2018-03-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-03-08SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-03-08SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-08SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/8/2018
2018-02-28SenateFN7: (CED)
2018-02-28SenateFN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2018-02-28SenateNR: OLSON
2018-02-28SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-02-28SenateFIN RPT CS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2018-02-21SenateWIELECHOWSKI, WILSON, KELLY, BISHOP
2018-02-21SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, COSTELLO, MACKINNON, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HUGHES, MEYER
2017-04-10SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
2017-04-10SenateFN5:(CED)
2017-04-10SenateFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-10SenateFN3: ZERO(LAW)
2017-04-10SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2017-04-10SenateAM: MEYER
2017-04-10SenateDP: WIELECHOWSKI, KELLY, COSTELLO
2017-04-10SenateNR: COGHILL
2017-04-10SenateJUD RPT CS 3DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE
2017-03-06SenateFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-06SenateFN3: ZERO(LAW)
2017-03-06SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2017-03-06SenateFN1: (CED)
2017-03-06SenateDP: COSTELLO, HUGHES, MEYER, GARDNER
2017-03-06SenateL&C RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
2017-01-18SenateL&C, JUD
2017-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback