AK SB148 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/23/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/23/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act excluding certain land from the Kachemak Bay Critical Habitat Area.
Title
Kachemak Bay Critical Habitat Area
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/23/14 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 3/25 CHAPTER 3 SLA 14 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 12:50 PM 3/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-02-26 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, CHENAULT |
2014-02-26 | House | VERSION: SB 148 |
2014-02-26 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-02-26 | House | PASSED Y35 E5 |
2014-02-26 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 148 |
2014-02-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2014-02-24 | House | NR: GRUENBERG, HERRON |
2014-02-24 | House | DP: OLSON, HAWKER, KELLER, CHENAULT, JOHNSON |
2014-02-24 | House | RLS RPT 5DP 2NR |
2014-02-12 | House | RLS |
2014-02-12 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-02-10 | Senate | VERSION: SB 148 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS |
2014-02-10 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 148 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2014 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | NR: FRENCH |
2014-02-07 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, MICCICHE, BISHOP, DYSON, FAIRCLOUGH, MCGUIRE |
2014-02-07 | Senate | RES RPT 6DP 1NR |
2014-02-03 | Senate | RES WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 |
2014-01-31 | Senate | RES |
2014-01-31 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |