AK SB140 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - BILL TABLED Y11 N8 E1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - BILL TABLED Y11 N8 E1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to school athletics, recreation, athletic teams, and sports.
Title
Designate Sex For School-sponsored Sports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Lay on the Table (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Take from the Table (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 7 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Return to Second for Amendments (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Take from the Table (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 7 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Return to Second for Amendments (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | BILL TABLED Y11 N8 E1 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | AM NO 5 BEFORE THE BODY |
2022-05-16 | Senate | CONSIDERATION POSTPONED TO 5/17/22 AT 9:00 A.M. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | TAKEN FROM THE TABLE Y12 N8 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | BILL TABLED WITH AM NO 5 PENDING UC |
2022-05-11 | Senate | AM NO 5 OFFERED |
2022-05-11 | Senate | AM NO 4 FAILED Y7 N10 E3 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y9 N8 E3 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMDS Y16 N1 E3 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2022-05-10 | Senate | CONSIDERATION NOT COMPLETE - ON 5/11 CALENDAR |
2022-05-10 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N12 E1 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | MOTION TO LIMIT DEBATE TO TWO MINUTES WITHDRAWN |
2022-05-10 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N10 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMDS UC |
2022-05-10 | Senate | BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING |
2022-05-09 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 5/9 - ON 5/10 CALENDAR |
2022-05-09 | Senate | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR UC |
2022-05-05 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 5/9 CAL |
2022-05-05 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 140(JUD) |
2022-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CAL |
2022-05-04 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-04 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-04 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2022 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | NR: MYERS |
2022-05-03 | Senate | DNP: KIEHL |
2022-05-03 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES |
2022-05-03 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 2DP 1DNP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | JUD REFERRAL ADDED AFTER EDC |
2022-04-08 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2022-04-08 | Senate | EDC RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD, SHOWER |
2021-05-12 | Senate | EDC |
2021-05-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Civil Procedure
Claims
Disclosure
Drugs
Education
Liability
Rights
School Districts
Schools
Sports
Universities
Women
Civil Procedure
Claims
Disclosure
Drugs
Education
Liability
Rights
School Districts
Schools
Sports
Universities
Women