AK SB140 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act creating the Arctic infrastructure development program and fund in the Alaska Industrial Development and Export Authority; and relating to dividends from the Alaska Industrial Development and Export Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aidea: Arctic Development Program/fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 140(FIN)? (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-17SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/14/14
2014-07-17SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 93 SLA 14
2014-07-14Senate11:13 AM 7/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-04-28HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 140(FIN) AM H(REENGROSSED)
2014-04-28HouseENGROSSED BILL SENT TO SENATE
2014-04-25SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
2014-04-25SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2014-04-25HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 140(FIN) AM H(REENGROSSED)
2014-04-25HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2014-04-21HouseENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
2014-04-21HousePASSED Y39 A1
2014-04-21HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2014-04-21House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2014-04-21HouseAM NO 1 WITHDRAWN
2014-04-21HouseRESCIND ACTION AM 1 UC
2014-04-21HouseRETURN TO SECOND TO RESCIND AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-21HouseRESCIND ACTION IN PASSING UC
2014-04-20HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): HERRON, DRUMMOND, LEDOUX
2014-04-20HouseENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
2014-04-20HousePASSED Y39 A1
2014-04-20HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 140(FIN) AM H
2014-04-20HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-20HouseAM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-20House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2014-04-20HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-20HouseFIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-20HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-20HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2014-04-20HouseRULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 4/20/14
2014-04-19HouseFN1: (CED)
2014-04-19HouseNR: NEUMAN
2014-04-19HouseSTOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
2014-04-19HouseDP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, THOMPSON, MUNOZ, GARA, EDGMON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO,
2014-04-19HouseFIN RPT HCS(FIN) 10DP 1NR
2014-04-15HouseFN1: (CED)
2014-04-15HouseNR: JOSEPHSON, REINBOLD, SADDLER
2014-04-15HouseDP: CHENAULT, HERRON, OLSON
2014-04-15HouseL&C RPT 3DP 3NR
2014-04-03HouseL&C, FIN
2014-04-03HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2014-04-02SenateVERSION: CSSB 140(FIN)
2014-04-02SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2014-04-02SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2014-04-02SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 140(FIN)
2014-04-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-02SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-02SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-02SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2014
2014-03-31SenateFN1: (CED)
2014-03-31SenateNR: OLSON
2014-03-31SenateDP: KELLY, MEYER, HOFFMAN, BISHOP
2014-03-31SenateFIN RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2014-03-14SenateFN1: (CED)
2014-03-14SenateNR: ELLIS
2014-03-14SenateDP: DUNLEAVY, STEDMAN, MICCICHE, OLSON
2014-03-14SenateL&C RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2014-01-27SenateL&C, FIN
2014-01-27SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback