AK SB137 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/18/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/18/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Alaska Seismic Hazards Safety Commission; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Seismic Hazards Safety Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/18/14 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 25 SLA 14 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 10:30 AM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, HUGHES |
2014-04-16 | House | VERSION: SB 137 |
2014-04-16 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-16 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2014-04-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 137 |
2014-04-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-11 | House | FN1: (DNR) |
2014-04-11 | House | NR: NEUMAN |
2014-04-11 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, HOLMES, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN |
2014-04-11 | House | FIN RPT 7DP 1NR |
2014-04-07 | House | FN1: (DNR) |
2014-04-07 | House | NR: KAWASAKI, HAWKER, OLSON |
2014-04-07 | House | DP: SEATON, JOHNSON, P.WILSON, TARR, FEIGE, SADDLER |
2014-04-07 | House | RES RPT 6DP 3NR |
2014-03-25 | House | RES, FIN |
2014-03-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-24 | Senate | VERSION: SB 137 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-03-24 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 137 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-24 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-24 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | FN1: (DNR) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | NR: DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2014-03-10 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, HOFFMAN |
2014-03-10 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 2NR |
2014-02-28 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED |
2014-02-28 | Senate | FN1: (DNR) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, FRENCH, MICCICHE, DYSON |
2014-02-28 | Senate | RES RPT 4DP |
2014-01-24 | Senate | RES |
2014-01-24 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |