AK SB136 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): VANCE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to firearms and other weapons restrictions; and relating to hunter and firearm safety education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitations On Firearms Restrictions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 as amended (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Intro: 3 min. Debate: 2 min. Closing: 2 min. (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 3 (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 6 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): VANCE
2022-05-18HouseADVANCED TO 3RD READING FAILED Y28 N12
2022-05-18HouseAM NO 6 FAILED Y2 N38
2022-05-18House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2022-05-18HouseAM NO 5 AS AMD ADOPTED Y27 N13
2022-05-18HouseAM 2 TO AM 5 AS AMD ADOPTED Y21 N16 A3
2022-05-18HouseAM 1 TO AM 5 ADOPTED Y35 N5
2022-05-18HouseAM NO 5 OFFERED
2022-05-18HouseLIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4
2022-05-18HouseAM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
2022-05-18HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y16 N24
2022-05-18HouseAM 1 TO AM 3 FAILED Y17 N23
2022-05-18HouseAM 1 TO AM 3 OFFERED AND PENDING
2022-05-18HouseAM NO 3 OFFERED
2022-05-18HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y6 N33 A1
2022-05-18HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2022-05-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-05-18HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2022
2022-05-17HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
2022-05-17HouseSTA REFERRAL REMOVED
2022-05-17HouseFN3: ZERO(LAW)
2022-05-17HouseAM: DRUMMOND, SCHRAGE
2022-05-17HouseNR: PATKOTAK
2022-05-17HouseDNP: HANNAN
2022-05-17HouseDP: MCCABE, PRAX, MCCARTY
2022-05-17HouseCRA RPT 3DP 1DNP 1NR 2AM
2022-05-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): PATKOTAK
2022-03-31HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): NELSON, KAUFMAN
2022-03-28HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): PRAX, LEBON
2022-03-24HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): MCCABE, CARPENTER
2022-03-22HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER, THOMPSON, GILLHAM, CRONK, MCCARTY
2022-03-18HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TILTON
2022-03-18HouseCRA, STA
2022-03-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2022-03-16SenateVERSION: CSSB 136(CRA)
2022-03-16SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2022-03-16SenateCOSPONSOR(S): STEDMAN, BISHOP, STEVENS, WIELECHOWSKI, KAWASAKI
2022-03-16SenatePASSED Y19 N- A1
2022-03-16SenateFN3: ZERO(LAW)
2022-03-16SenateMOTION TO ADOPT NEW FISCAL NOTE UC
2022-03-16SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 136(CRA)
2022-03-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/16 CAL
2022-03-15SenateCRA CS ADOPTED UC
2022-03-15SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-03-15SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2022
2022-03-04SenateFN2: ZERO(LAW)
2022-03-04SenateNR: REINBOLD, KAWASAKI
2022-03-04SenateDP: SHOWER, COSTELLO, HOLLAND
2022-03-04SenateSTA RPT CS(CRA) 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
2021-05-19SenateFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2021-05-19SenateDNP: GRAY-JACKSON
2021-05-19SenateDP: HUGHES, MYERS
2021-05-19SenateCRA RPT CS 2DP 1DNP SAME TITLE
2021-05-10SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, MICCICHE
2021-05-05SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, HOLLAND, SHOWER, REVAK, WILSON
2021-05-05SenateCRA, STA
2021-05-05SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=SB136
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0136A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0136B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/F/SB0136-1-2-051921-LAW-N.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=SB136&Page=02033#2033
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB136&Page=03070#AM2
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB136&Page=03074#3074
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB136&Page=03075#AM3
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB136&Page=03075#3075
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB136&Page=03076#3076
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB136&Page=03077#3077
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB136&Page=03078#AM5
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB136&Page=03078#AM6
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB136&Page=03079#3079

Bill Comments

feedback