AK SB134 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to master guide-outfitter qualifications for licensure; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Master Guide-outfitter Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2021-05-18HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR
2021-05-18HouseVERSION: CSSB 134(RES)
2021-05-18HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2021-05-18HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-05-18HousePASSED Y39 N1
2021-05-18HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 134(RES)
2021-05-18HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-18HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
2021-05-18HouseFN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2021-05-18HouseAM: SCHRAGE, HANNAN, HOPKINS
2021-05-18HouseNR: GILLHAM, RAUSCHER, CRONK, PATKOTAK
2021-05-18HouseDP: FIELDS, MCKAY
2021-05-18HouseRES RPT 2DP 4NR 3AM
2021-05-15HouseRES
2021-05-15HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-14SenateVERSION: CSSB 134(RES)
2021-05-14SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-05-14SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-05-14SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2021-05-14SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 134(RES)
2021-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CALENDAR
2021-05-12SenateRES CS ADOPTED UC
2021-05-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-12SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2021
2021-05-07SenateFN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2021-05-07SenateAM: BISHOP
2021-05-07SenateNR: KIEHL, MICCICHE, STEVENS, KAWASAKI
2021-05-07SenateDP: REVAK
2021-05-07SenateRES RPT CS 1DP 4NR 1AM NEW TITLE
2021-04-28SenateRES
2021-04-28SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback