AK SB132 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-05 - FN1: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-05 - FN1: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act exempting veterinarians from the requirements of the controlled substance prescription database.
Title
Controlled Sub. Data: Exempt Veterinarian
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2022-10-05 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281 |
2022-10-05 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22 |
2022-05-14 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2022-05-09 | House | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2022-05-09 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2022-05-09 | House | AM: FIELDS, PRAX, KURKA, ZULKOSKY |
2022-05-09 | House | DP: SPOHNHOLZ |
2022-05-09 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 15 |
2022-05-09 | House | HSS RPT HCS(HSS) NEW TITLE 1DP 4AM |
2022-04-29 | House | KAUFMAN, KURKA, MCCARTY |
2022-04-29 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TILTON, CARPENTER, GILLHAM, MCCABE, JOHNSON, CRONK, MCKAY, |
2022-04-19 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): PRAX |
2022-04-04 | House | HSS, L&C |
2022-04-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-03-28 | Senate | VERSION: SB 132 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-03-28 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N- E3 A1 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, WILSON |
2022-03-28 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 132 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, REINBOLD, BISHOP, BEGICH, SHOWER, MYERS, MICCICHE |
2022-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/28 CAL |
2022-03-25 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-25 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-03-23 | Senate | FIN RPT 7DP |
2022-03-04 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C |
2022-03-04 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | DP: GRAY-JACKSON |
2022-03-04 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO, REVAK |
2022-03-04 | Senate | L&C RPT 2NR 1DP |
2022-02-09 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | DP: WILSON, REINBOLD, BEGICH, HUGHES |
2022-02-09 | Senate | HSS RPT 4DP |
2021-05-05 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON |
2021-04-28 | Senate | HSS, L&C |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Animals
Business
Drugs
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Business
Drugs
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists