AK SB132 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to exemptions from the payment of motor vehicle registration fees for residents 65 years of age or older; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration Fees Seniors
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Fairclough MacKinnon [R] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/15 |
2014-07-17 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/16 CHAPTER 88 SLA 14 |
2014-07-14 | Senate | 11:13 AM 7/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-15 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI, TARR |
2014-04-15 | House | VERSION: CSSB 132(STA) |
2014-04-15 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-15 | House | PASSED Y35 E3 A2 |
2014-04-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 132(STA) |
2014-04-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-15 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-25 | House | DP: GATTIS, KELLER, KREISS-TOMKINS, HUGHES, ISAACSON, LYNN |
2014-03-25 | House | STA RPT 6DP |
2014-03-24 | House | STA |
2014-03-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-21 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 132(STA) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-03-21 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 132(STA) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-21 | Senate | STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-21 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-19 | Senate | HELD TO 3/21 CALENDAR |
2014-03-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | AM: DUNLEAVY |
2014-02-24 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2014-02-24 | Senate | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, HOFFMAN |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(STA) 3DP 1NR 1AM |
2014-02-12 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-02-12 | Senate | STA RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2014-01-22 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2014-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |