AK SB130 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to a vote of the people before a broad-based individual income tax or statewide sales tax takes effect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Approval For New Taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-26SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-02-28SenateFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2018-02-26SenateNR: GIESSEL, EGAN
2018-02-26SenateDNP: COGHILL
2018-02-26SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON
2018-02-26SenateSTA RPT CS 2DP 1DNP 2NR NEW TITLE
2018-01-22SenateCOSPONSOR(S): WILSON, HUGHES
2018-01-16SenateSTA, FIN
2018-01-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-01-16SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/18

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback