AK SB130 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to confidential information status and public record status of information in the possession of the Department of Revenue; relating to interest applicable to delinquent tax; relating to disclosure of oil and gas production tax credit information; relating to refunds for the gas storage facility tax credit, the liquefied natural gas storage facility tax credit, and the qualified in-state oil refinery infrastructure expenditures tax credit; relating to the minimum tax for certain oil and gas production; relating to the minimum tax calculation for monthly installment payments of estimated tax; relating to interest on monthly installment payments of estimated tax; relating to limitations for the application of tax credits; relating to oil and gas production tax credits for certain losses and expenditures; relating to limitations for nontransferable oil and gas production tax credits based on oil production and the alternative tax credit for oil and gas exploration; relating to purchase of tax credit certificates from the oil and gas tax credit fund; relating to a minimum for gross value at the point of production; relating to lease expenditures and tax credits for municipal entities; adding a definition for "qualified capital expenditure"; adding a definition for "outstanding liability to the state"; repealing oil and gas exploration incentive credits; repealing the limitation on the application of credits against tax liability for lease expenditures incurred before January 1, 2011; repealing provisions related to the monthly installment payments for estimated tax for oil and gas produced before January 1, 2014; repealing the oil and gas production tax credit for qualified capital expenditures and certain well expenditures; repealing the calculation for certain lease expenditures applicable before January 1, 2011; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tax;credits;interest;refunds;o & G
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-04-13 | Senate | FN3: (REV) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | AM: WIELECHOWSKI, STEDMAN |
2016-04-13 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO, COGHILL, MICCICHE, STOLTZE |
2016-04-13 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL |
2016-04-13 | Senate | RES RPT CS 1DP 4NR 2AM NEW TITLE |
2016-01-19 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2016-01-19 | Senate | FN2: (REV) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | RES, FIN |
2016-01-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |