AK SB128 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the marijuana education and treatment fund; and relating to the duties of the Department of Health and Social Services to administer a comprehensive marijuana use education and treatment program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana Edu/treatment Fund/program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2018-05-01HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2018-05-01HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-05-01HouseFIN
2018-05-01HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-05-01SenateVERSION: CSSB 128(FIN)
2018-05-01SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-05-01SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, BISHOP, STEVENS, KELLY
2018-05-01SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-05-01SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 128(FIN)
2018-04-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
2018-04-30SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-30SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-30SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2018
2018-04-25SenateNR: OLSON
2018-04-27SenateFN4: (DHS)
2018-04-27SenateFN3: (DHS)
2018-04-25SenateDP: MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-04-25SenateFIN RPT CS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE
2018-02-05SenateFN2: (DHS)
2018-02-05SenateFN1: (DHS)
2018-02-05SenateDP: WILSON, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, GIESSEL
2018-02-05SenateHSS RPT 4DP
2018-01-16SenateHSS, FIN
2018-01-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-01-16SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/18

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback