AK SB128 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - FIFTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL - WITH PASSAGE OF SCR 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - FIFTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL - WITH PASSAGE OF SCR 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, the earnings of the Alaska permanent fund, and the earnings reserve account; relating to management of the budget reserve fund (art. IX, sec. 17, Constitution of the State of Alaska) by the Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation; relating to procurement by the Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation; relating to the mental health trust fund; relating to deposits into the dividend fund; relating to the calculation of permanent fund dividends; relating to unrestricted state revenue available for appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Perm. Fund:deposits;dividend;earnings
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration Effective Dates (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | FIFTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL - WITH PASSAGE OF SCR 501 |
2016-07-13 | House | FIFTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2016-06-13 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-06-13 | House | FIN |
2016-06-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-06-06 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 128(FIN) |
2016-06-06 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2016-06-06 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y14 N5 E1 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2016-06-06 | Senate | MCGUIRE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2016-06-06 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N5 E1 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 128(FIN) |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-06-06 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-06-06 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-06-06 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 6/6/16 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | NR: KELLY |
2016-06-06 | Senate | DNP: DUNLEAVY |
2016-06-06 | Senate | DP: MACKINNON, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, OLSON, BISHOP |
2016-06-06 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 5DP 1DNP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2016-05-23 | House | FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2016-05-23 | Senate | FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL - WITH PASSAGE OF HCR 401 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(REV) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(REV) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | NR: STOLTZE, COGHILL, HUGGINS, MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI |
2016-03-16 | Senate | STA RPT 5NR |
2016-01-19 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2016-01-19 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(REV) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(REV) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2016-01-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appropriations
Finance
Funds
Leases
Minerals
Oil & Gas
Permanent Fund
Public Corporations
Public Finance
Revenue
Taxation
Finance
Funds
Leases
Minerals
Oil & Gas
Permanent Fund
Public Corporations
Public Finance
Revenue
Taxation