AK SB127 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - IN ACCORDANCE WITH UR 48(B) MOVED TO FINANCE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - IN ACCORDANCE WITH UR 48(B) MOVED TO FINANCE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to criminal law and procedure; relating to controlled substances; relating to victims of criminal offenses; relating to probation; relating to sentencing; relating to treatment program credit for time spent toward service of a sentence of imprisonment; relating to the Violent Crimes Compensation Board; relating to permanent fund dividends; relating to electronic monitoring; relating to penalties for violating municipal ordinances; relating to parole; relating to community work service; relating to revocation, termination, suspension, cancellation, or restoration of a driver's license; relating to the duties of the commissioner of corrections; relating to the duties of the Department of Health and Social Services; relating to civil in rem forfeiture actions; providing for an effective date by repealing sec. 193, ch. 36, SLA 2016, sec. 79, ch. 1, 4SSLA 2017, sec. 81, ch. 1, 4SSLA 2017, and sec. 83, ch. 1, 4SSLA 2017; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Criminal Law;parole;probation;sentencing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | IN ACCORDANCE WITH UR 48(B) MOVED TO FINANCE |
2018-04-06 | Senate | JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | UR 48(A) REQUEST RECEIVED |
2018-01-22 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): WILSON |
2018-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-16 | Senate | JUD, FIN |
2018-01-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-01-16 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/18 |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Alcohol
Appeals
Attorney General
Boards & Commissions
Civil Procedure
Corrections
Court Rules
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Drugs
Funds
Health & Social Services
Procurements
Public Assistance
Public Safety
Regulations
Sentencing
Sunset
Victims Rights
Weapons
Witnesses
Alcohol
Appeals
Attorney General
Boards & Commissions
Civil Procedure
Corrections
Court Rules
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Drugs
Funds
Health & Social Services
Procurements
Public Assistance
Public Safety
Regulations
Sentencing
Sunset
Victims Rights
Weapons
Witnesses
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=SB127 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0127A.PDF |