AK SB126 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for an exception to the regulation of the practice of medicine for a physician who provides medical services to an athletic team from another state.
Title
Visiting Physicians With Sports Teams
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/16/18 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 28 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | 12:54 PM 6/13/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-05-01 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2018-05-01 | House | VERSION: SB 126 |
2018-05-01 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-01 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E2 |
2018-05-01 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2018-05-01 | House | SADDLER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-05-01 | House | PASSED Y37 E2 A1 |
2018-05-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 126 |
2018-04-30 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR |
2018-04-30 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-30 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA |
2018-04-12 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2018-04-12 | House | FOSTER |
2018-04-12 | House | DP: GARA, WILSON, KAWASAKI, GRENN, ORTIZ, TILTON, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, |
2018-04-12 | House | FIN RPT 10DP |
2018-03-15 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2018-03-15 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KNOPP, KITO |
2018-03-15 | House | L&C RPT 6DP |
2018-02-14 | House | L&C, FIN |
2018-02-14 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-02-12 | Senate | VERSION: SB 126 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- V1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 126 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-02-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-02-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/12/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | DP: MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-02-05 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP |
2018-01-31 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C |
2018-01-31 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, MEYER, GARDNER |
2018-01-31 | Senate | L&C RPT 4DP |
2018-01-16 | Senate | L&C |
2018-01-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-01-16 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/18 |