AK SB125 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the transferability of hunts awarded by drawing; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hunting Permits: Transferability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/21 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 18 SLA 21 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | 12:25 P.M. 7/9/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, SCHRAGE, TILTON |
2021-05-19 | House | VERSION: CSSB 125(RES) |
2021-05-19 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-19 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-19 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2021-05-19 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 125(RES) |
2021-05-19 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-19 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021 |
2021-05-19 | House | LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1 |
2021-05-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCKAY |
2021-05-13 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HANNAN |
2021-05-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2021-05-13 | House | NR: SCHRAGE |
2021-05-13 | House | DP: GILLHAM, HANNAN, HOPKINS, FIELDS, MCKAY, PATKOTAK |
2021-05-13 | House | RES RPT 6DP 1NR |
2021-04-30 | House | RES |
2021-04-30 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-30 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 125(RES) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-04-30 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N- E4 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | STEVENS, BEGICH, SHOWER, COSTELLO, HOLLAND, WILSON, MICCICHE |
2021-04-30 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KIEHL, REVAK, GRAY-JACKSON, HUGHES, KAWASAKI, BISHOP, REINBOLD, |
2021-04-30 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 125(RES) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-04-30 | Senate | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-04-30 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-04-30 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | DP: REVAK, KIEHL, VON IMHOF, BISHOP, KAWASAKI |
2021-04-28 | Senate | RES RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE |
2021-04-16 | Senate | RES |
2021-04-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |