AK SB124 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-14)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-14)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Council on Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extending Council On Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/14 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 43 SLA 14 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 10:30 AM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-07 | House | JOSEPHSON, PRUITT |
2014-04-07 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, LEDOUX, JOHNSON, KAWASAKI, ISAACSON, OLSON, |
2014-04-07 | House | VERSION: SB 124 |
2014-04-07 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-07 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-07 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2014-04-07 | House | CROSS SPONSORS CHANGED: FIRST HOLMES, SECOND STOLTZE |
2014-04-07 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 124 |
2014-04-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2014 |
2014-04-04 | House | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE |
2014-04-04 | House | FN1: (DPS) |
2014-04-04 | House | DP: GRUENBERG, CHENAULT, HAWKER, KELLER, HERRON, OLSON |
2014-04-04 | House | RLS RPT 6DP |
2014-03-12 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMPSON |
2014-03-06 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, GUTTENBERG, GARA, TARR |
2014-03-06 | House | FN1: (DPS) |
2014-03-06 | House | DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, T.WILSON, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN |
2014-03-06 | House | FIN RPT 8DP |
2014-02-28 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, HOLMES, TUCK |
2014-02-28 | House | FIN |
2014-02-28 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-02-26 | Senate | VERSION: SB 124 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-02-26 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-02-26 | Senate | STEDMAN, HUGGINS, KELLY |
2014-02-26 | Senate | DUNLEAVY, COGHILL, MCGUIRE, GARDNER, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, GIESSEL, EGAN, |
2014-02-26 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, OLSON, STEVENS, FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, ELLIS, DYSON, |
2014-02-26 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 124 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-26 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-26 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FN1: (DPS) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, DUNLEAVY, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, OLSON |
2014-02-24 | Senate | FIN RPT 5DP |
2014-02-14 | Senate | FN1: (DPS) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-02-14 | Senate | STA RPT 4DP |
2014-01-22 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2014-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |