AK SB122 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): KURKA
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the definition of 'victim.'

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victim Definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KURKA
2021-05-18HouseREFERRED TO RULES
2021-05-18HouseFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2021-05-18HouseNR: DRUMMOND, CLAMAN
2021-05-18HouseDP: EASTMAN, VANCE, SNYDER, KREISS-TOMKINS, KURKA
2021-05-18HouseJUD RPT HCS(JUD) 5DP 2NR
2021-05-06HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
2021-05-06HouseJUD
2021-05-06HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-05SenateVERSION: SB 122
2021-05-05SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-05-05SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, HUGHES, HOLLAND, SHOWER, MICCICHE
2021-05-05SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2021-05-05SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 122
2021-05-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-05SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-05SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2021
2021-04-28SenateFN1: ZERO(LAW)
2021-04-28SenateDP: HOLLAND, MYERS, HUGHES, SHOWER, KIEHL
2021-04-28SenateJUD RPT 5DP
2021-04-07SenateJUD
2021-04-07SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback