AK SB121 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/17/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/17/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to a security freeze on the consumer credit report of a minor, incapacitated person, or protected person.
Title
Security Freeze On Certain Credit Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 121(JUD)? (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/17/16 |
2016-07-11 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/19 CHAPTER 22 SLA 16 |
2016-06-11 | Senate | 3:53 PM 6/8/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-17 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2016-04-17 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2016-04-17 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2016-04-17 | House | VERSION: CSSB 121(JUD) AM H |
2016-04-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2016-04-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, JOSEPHSON |
2016-04-17 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2016-04-17 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-17 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2016-04-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 121(JUD) |
2016-04-17 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2016-04-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COLVER |
2016-04-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR |
2016-04-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-16 | House | RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 4/16/2016 PENDING REPORT |
2016-04-16 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2016-04-16 | House | AM: CLAMAN, LEDOUX |
2016-04-16 | House | NR: KREISS-TOMKINS, KELLER |
2016-04-16 | House | DP: FOSTER |
2016-04-16 | House | JUD RPT 1DP 2NR 2AM |
2016-04-13 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN |
2016-04-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2016-04-09 | House | NR: LEDOUX, TILTON, JOSEPHSON |
2016-04-09 | House | DP: HUGHES, COLVER, OLSON |
2016-04-09 | House | L&C RPT 3DP 3NR |
2016-03-04 | House | L&C, JUD |
2016-03-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-03-02 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 121(JUD) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N- E3 A1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, BISHOP, COGHILL, HOFFMAN, MACKINNON |
2016-03-02 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 121(JUD) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-03-02 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-03-02 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-03-02 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | DP: MCGUIRE, COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI |
2016-02-19 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 3DP NEW TITLE |
2016-02-08 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE, GARDNER, EGAN |
2016-01-29 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER, ELLIS |
2016-01-29 | Senate | L&C RPT 4DP |
2016-01-27 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, STEVENS |
2016-01-19 | Senate | L&C, JUD |
2016-01-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-01-19 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/16 |