AK SB12 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-14 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/13/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-14 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/13/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to temporary courtesy licenses for military spouses; and relating to the Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development.
Title
Military Spouse Courtesy License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-14 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/13/21 |
2021-09-14 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 9/14 CHAPTER 34 SLA 21 |
2021-08-30 | Senate | 2:58 P.M. 8/27/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | House | JOSEPHSON, NELSON |
2021-05-19 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY, JOHNSON, HOPKINS, SCHRAGE, TARR, SPOHNHOLZ, RAUSCHER, |
2021-05-19 | House | VERSION: SB 12 |
2021-05-19 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-19 | House | PASSED Y37 N1 A2 |
2021-05-19 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 12 |
2021-05-19 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-19 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021 |
2021-05-19 | House | LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1 |
2021-05-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-05-15 | House | DP: KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-05-15 | House | L&C RPT 6DP |
2021-05-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-05-14 | House | DP: NELSON, STORY, RAUSCHER, SHAW, TARR, TUCK |
2021-05-14 | House | MLV RPT 6DP |
2021-05-06 | House | MLV REPLACES STA REFERRAL |
2021-05-04 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2021-05-04 | House | STA, L&C |
2021-05-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-03 | Senate | VERSION: SB 12 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | HUGHES, REINBOLD, STEDMAN, BISHOP, MICCICHE |
2021-05-03 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, REVAK, HOLLAND, STEVENS, GRAY-JACKSON, WIELECHOWSKI, |
2021-05-03 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 12 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-03 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-03 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, REVAK, GRAY-JACKSON |
2021-04-28 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP |
2021-04-23 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | NR: HOLLAND |
2021-04-23 | Senate | DP: SHOWER, KAWASAKI, COSTELLO |
2021-04-23 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP 1NR |
2021-01-22 | Senate | STA, L&C |
2021-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-01-22 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |
Subjects
Economic Development
Legislative Committees
Licensing
Marriage
Military
Occupations & Professions
Publications
Legislative Committees
Licensing
Marriage
Military
Occupations & Professions
Publications