AK SB110 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF 7/1/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF 7/1/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to post-conviction DNA testing, to the preservation of certain evidence, and to the DNA identification registration system; relating to post-conviction relief procedures; relating to representation by the public defender; amending Rule 35.1, Alaska Rules of Criminal Procedure; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Preservation Of Evidence/dna I.d. System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF 7/1/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/14 CHAPTER 20 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-07-09 | 11:28 AM 5/3/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-16 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-16 | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-16 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-04-16 | TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-15 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD | |
2010-04-14 | VERSION: HCS CSSB 110(FIN) | |
2010-04-14 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-14 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, LYNN, GARA, KAWASAKI, JOHNSON | |
2010-04-14 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-14 | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-14 | PASSED Y40 | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 110(FIN) | |
2010-04-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-14 | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | FN7: ZERO(H.FIN/LAW) | |
2010-04-13 | FN5: ZERO(DPS) | |
2010-04-13 | FN4: ZERO(S.FIN/DPS) | |
2010-04-13 | NR: THOMAS, KELLY, AUSTERMAN, SALMON, N.FOSTER | |
2010-04-13 | DP: GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-13 | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 25 | |
2010-04-13 | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 6DP 5NR | |
2010-04-09 | FN6: (LAW) | |
2010-04-09 | FN5: ZERO(DPS) | |
2010-04-09 | FN4: ZERO(S.FIN/DPS) | |
2010-04-09 | DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, HERRON, HOLMES, GATTO, RAMRAS | |
2010-04-09 | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 25 | |
2010-04-09 | JUD RPT HCS(JUD) NT 6DP | |
2010-03-19 | JUD, FIN | |
2010-03-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-17 | VERSION: CSSB 110(FIN) | |
2010-03-17 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-03-17 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-03-17 | MCGUIRE, HUGGINS, STEDMAN, THOMAS, STEVENS | |
2010-03-17 | COSPONSOR(S): WAGONER, DYSON, ELLIS, PASKVAN, MENARD, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN, MEYER, | |
2010-03-17 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 110(FIN) | |
2010-03-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-17 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2010 | |
2010-03-15 | FN6: (LAW) | |
2010-03-15 | FN5: ZERO(DPS) | |
2010-03-15 | FN4: ZERO(S.FIN/DPS) | |
2010-03-15 | NR: HUGGINS, OLSON | |
2010-03-15 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-03-15 | FIN RPT CS 5DP 2NR NEW TITLE | |
2009-04-07 | FN3: (LAW) | |
2009-04-07 | FN2: (DPS) | |
2009-04-07 | FN1: ZERO(DPS) | |
2009-04-07 | NR: THERRIAULT, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE | |
2009-04-07 | DP: FRENCH | |
2009-04-07 | JUD RPT CS 1DP 3NR NEW TITLE | |
2009-02-17 | JUD, FIN | |
2009-02-17 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Boards & Commissions
Civil Procedure
Corrections
Court Rules
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Law Enforcement
Legislators
Municipalities
Native Organizations
Public Defender
Public Safety
Science & Technology
Victims Rights
Boards & Commissions
Civil Procedure
Corrections
Court Rules
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Law Enforcement
Legislators
Municipalities
Native Organizations
Public Defender
Public Safety
Science & Technology
Victims Rights