AK SB11 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to community property and to community property trusts; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Property Trusts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-11SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2022-05-10HouseVERSION: CSSB 11(JUD)
2022-05-10HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2022-05-10HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2022-05-10HousePASSED Y38 N2
2022-05-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 11(JUD)
2022-05-10HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2022-05-10HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-05-10HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2022
2022-03-14HouseFN2: ZERO(AJS)
2022-03-14HouseNR: EASTMAN, DRUMMOND, KURKA, KREISS-TOMKINS, SNYDER
2022-03-14HouseDP: CLAMAN
2022-03-14HouseJUD RPT 1DP 5NR
2022-02-16HouseFN2: ZERO(AJS)
2022-02-16HouseNR: NELSON, KAUFMAN
2022-02-16HouseDP: SNYDER, MCCARTY, SCHRAGE, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS
2022-02-16HouseL&C RPT 5DP 2NR
2021-05-18HouseL&C, JUD
2021-05-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-17SenateVERSION: CSSB 11(JUD)
2021-05-17SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-05-17SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-05-17SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2021-05-17SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 11(JUD)
2021-05-15Senate5/15 SESSION XLD - ADVANCED TO 3RD READING 5/17 CAL
2021-05-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
2021-05-14SenateJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2021-05-14SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-14SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2021
2021-05-11SenateFN1: ZERO(AJS)
2021-05-11SenateNR: MYERS, SHOWER
2021-05-11SenateDP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, KIEHL
2021-05-11SenateJUD RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
2021-03-22SenateFN1: ZERO(AJS)
2021-03-22SenateDP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, HOLLAND
2021-03-22SenateL&C RPT 4DP
2021-01-22SenateL&C, JUD
2021-01-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-01-22SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback