AK SB108 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN2: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the State Medical Board; relating to the licensing of physicians, osteopaths, and podiatrists; relating to the certification of medical assistants; relating to the practice of medicine; relating to the practice of podiatry; relating to the practice of osteopathy; relating to assault of a medical professional; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Care/licensing/medical Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseFN2: (CED)
2018-06-27HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
2018-06-27HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-06-27SenateLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-03-30HouseREFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
2018-03-30HouseFN2: (CED)
2018-03-30HouseAM: EASTMAN
2018-03-30HouseNR: ZULKOSKY, KITO
2018-03-30HouseDP: JOHNSTON, TARR, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SPOHNHOLZ
2018-03-30HouseHSS RPT 4DP 2NR 1AM
2018-03-22HouseHSS, L&C, FIN
2018-03-22HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-21SenateVERSION: CSSSSB 108(FIN)
2018-03-21SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-03-21SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, MEYER, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, HUGHES
2018-03-21SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-03-21SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-03-21SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSSSB 108(FIN)
2018-03-19SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/21 CALENDAR
2018-03-19SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-03-19SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-19SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2018
2018-03-14SenateFN2: (CED)
2018-03-14SenateNR: OLSON
2018-03-14SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS
2018-03-14SenateFIN RPT CS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE
2018-02-14SenateFN1: (CED)
2018-02-14SenateDP: COSTELLO, STEVENS, MICCICHE, MEYER, GARDNER
2018-02-14SenateL&C RPT 5DP
2018-01-18SenateL&C, FIN
2018-01-18SenateSPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
2017-04-07SenateL&C, FIN
2017-04-07SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback