AK SB108 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN2: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN2: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the State Medical Board; relating to the licensing of physicians, osteopaths, and podiatrists; relating to the certification of medical assistants; relating to the practice of medicine; relating to the practice of podiatry; relating to the practice of osteopathy; relating to assault of a medical professional; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medical Care/licensing/medical Board
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Giessel [R] | Sen. Peter Micciche [R] | Sen. Kevin Meyer [R] | Sen. Anna Fairclough MacKinnon [R] |
Sen. Click Bishop [R] | Sen. Gary Stevens [R] | Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | FN2: (CED) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-03-30 | House | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2018-03-30 | House | FN2: (CED) |
2018-03-30 | House | AM: EASTMAN |
2018-03-30 | House | NR: ZULKOSKY, KITO |
2018-03-30 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SPOHNHOLZ |
2018-03-30 | House | HSS RPT 4DP 2NR 1AM |
2018-03-22 | House | HSS, L&C, FIN |
2018-03-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-03-21 | Senate | VERSION: CSSSSB 108(FIN) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, MEYER, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, HUGHES |
2018-03-21 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-03-21 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSSB 108(FIN) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/21 CALENDAR |
2018-03-19 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-03-19 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-03-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-03-14 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS |
2018-03-14 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2018-02-14 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, STEVENS, MICCICHE, MEYER, GARDNER |
2018-02-14 | Senate | L&C RPT 5DP |
2018-01-18 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2018-01-18 | Senate | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS |
2017-04-07 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2017-04-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Employment
Hospitals
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Permits
Physicians
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Employment
Hospitals
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Permits
Physicians