AK SB107 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the Alaska capital income fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alaska Capital Income Fund

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-04HouseVERSION: SB 107
2018-05-04HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-04HousePASSED Y36 N2 E2
2018-05-04HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 107
2018-05-03HouseADJOURNED TO 5/4 CALENDAR
2018-05-02HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CALENDAR
2018-05-02HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-02HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2018
2018-04-11HouseFN2: ZERO(H.FIN)
2018-04-11HouseNR: WILSON, PRUITT, TILTON
2018-04-11HouseDP: GARA, KAWASAKI, GRENN, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-11HouseFIN RPT 7DP 3NR
2017-04-13HouseFIN
2017-04-13HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-12SenateVERSION: SB 107
2017-04-12SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-04-12SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-04-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 107
2017-04-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-12SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2017
2017-04-11SenateFN1: ZERO(S.FIN)
2017-04-11SenateNR: OLSON
2017-04-11SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
2017-04-11SenateFIN RPT 5DP 1NR
2017-04-05SenateFIN
2017-04-05SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback