AK SB106 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for certain individuals who have erected a building on land leased from the state to receive a preference right to purchase certain state land without competitive bid.
Title
State Land Disp./leaseholder Preference
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/14 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 71 SLA 14 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-27 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) - SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE |
2014-04-19 | House | VERSION: CSSB 106(STA) |
2014-04-19 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-19 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2014-04-18 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, COSTELLO |
2014-04-18 | House | JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-04-18 | House | PASSED Y36 E1 A3 |
2014-04-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 106(STA) |
2014-04-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-18 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/18/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GATTIS, ISAACSON, KELLER |
2014-03-25 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2014-03-25 | House | DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN |
2014-03-25 | House | STA RPT 5DP |
2014-03-24 | House | STA |
2014-03-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-21 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 106(STA) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | STEDMAN, EGAN, HUGGINS, MICCICHE |
2014-03-21 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, DUNLEAVY, KELLY, DYSON, BISHOP, GIESSEL, |
2014-03-21 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 106(STA) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-21 | Senate | STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-21 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-19 | Senate | HELD TO 3/21 CALENDAR |
2014-03-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-02-26 | Senate | DP: DYSON, GIESSEL |
2014-02-26 | Senate | STA RPT CS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2014-01-22 | Senate | STA |
2014-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-22 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14 |