AK SB105 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression
Action: 2009-04-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to continuing the secondary public education of a homeless student; relating to the purpose of certain laws as they relate to children; relating to tuition waivers, loans, and medical assistance for a child placed in out-of-home care by the state; relating to foster care; relating to children in need of aid; relating to foster care transition to independent living; and relating to juvenile programs and institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster Care/cina/education Of Homeless

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-14 REFERRED TO FINANCE
2009-04-14 FN7: (DHS)
2009-04-14 FN6: (EED)
2009-04-14 FN5: ZERO(EED)
2009-04-14 FN4: (UA)
2009-04-14 FN2: (DHS)
2009-04-14 FN1: (DHS)
2009-04-14 NR: DYSON
2009-04-14 DP: DAVIS, THOMAS, ELLIS, PASKVAN
2009-04-14 HSS RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2009-04-06 FN6: (EED)
2009-04-06 FN5: ZERO(EED)
2009-04-06 FN4: (UA)
2009-04-06 FN3: (DHS)
2009-04-06 FN2: (DHS)
2009-04-06 FN1: (DHS)
2009-04-06 AM: HUGGINS
2009-04-06 NR: OLSON, STEVENS
2009-04-06 DP: DAVIS
2009-04-06 EDC RPT CS 1DP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE
2009-02-19 COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS
2009-02-11 EDC, HSS, FIN
2009-02-11 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback