AK SB104 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to appropriations from the dividend fund; creating the criminal fund; relating to appropriations from the criminal fund for payments for crime victims, operating costs of the Violent Crimes Compensation Board, grants for the operation of sexual assault response teams and domestic violence intervention projects, and incarceration costs; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Appropriations From The Dividend Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - Senate - Senate: CSSB 104(FIN) Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-04-07 | House | FIN |
2014-04-07 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-04 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 104(FIN) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-04 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, HUGGINS |
2014-04-04 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH, DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, MCGUIRE, |
2014-04-04 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 104(FIN) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-04 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-04 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-04 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2014 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | FN7: (S.FIN/COR) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | NR: KELLY, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, OLSON |
2014-03-31 | Senate | DP: MEYER, DUNLEAVY |
2014-03-31 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 2DP 4NR NEW TITLE |
2014-02-14 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(REV) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | FN4: INDETERMINATE(COR) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | FN1: (REV) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-02-14 | Senate | STA RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2014-01-29 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS |
2014-01-24 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER |
2014-01-22 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2014-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-22 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14 |
Subjects
Child Support
Corrections
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Funds
Nonprofit Organizations
Permanent Fund
State Aid
Victims Rights
Corrections
Crimes
Domestic Violence
Funds
Nonprofit Organizations
Permanent Fund
State Aid
Victims Rights