AK SB103 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to deposits into the dividend fund and income of and appropriations from the earnings reserve account; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pfd Appropriations; Earning Reserve

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateRETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
2019-05-02SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 103(FIN)
2019-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR
2019-05-01SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2019-05-01SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-01SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2019
2019-04-30SenateFN1: INDETERMINATE(S.FIN/REV)
2019-04-30SenateDNP: WIELECHOWSKI
2019-04-30SenateAM: VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WILSON, BISHOP
2019-04-30SenateDP: STEDMAN
2019-04-30SenateFIN RPT CS 1DP 4AM 1DNP NEW TITLE
2019-04-05SenateFIN
2019-04-05SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback