AK SB103 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-09 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-09 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to school districts; relating to school boards; relating to approval of educational programs at residential psychiatric treatment centers; providing for funding of educational services for students in residential psychiatric treatment centers; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Residential Psychiatric Education Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-04-09 | House | FIN |
2016-04-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-08 | Senate | VERSION: CSSSSB 103(JUD) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2016-04-07 | Senate | COSTELLO WITHDRAWN AS COSPONSOR |
2016-04-07 | Senate | WIELECHOWSKI NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2016-04-07 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y14 N3 E1 A2 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | PASSED Y11 N6 E1 A2 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSSB 103(JUD) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/7 CALENDAR |
2016-04-06 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-06 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-06 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2016 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO |
2016-04-01 | Senate | DNP: WIELECHOWSKI |
2016-04-01 | Senate | DP: MCGUIRE, COGHILL, MICCICHE |
2016-04-01 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 3DP 1DNP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2016-03-02 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | NR: GARDNER |
2016-03-02 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, GIESSEL, HUGGINS |
2016-03-02 | Senate | EDC RPT 3DP 1NR |
2016-02-17 | Senate | EDC, JUD |
2016-02-17 | Senate | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS |
2015-04-10 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS, COSTELLO |
2015-04-10 | Senate | EDC, JUD |
2015-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Disabilities
Education
Health & Social Services
Mental Health
Minors
Residential Care
School Districts
Schools
State Aid
Vocational Training
Education
Health & Social Services
Mental Health
Minors
Residential Care
School Districts
Schools
State Aid
Vocational Training