AK SB103 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the medical examination requirements for firefighters entitled to a presumption of compensability for a disability resulting from certain diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation For Firefighters

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-03 REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
2012-02-03 L&C, FIN
2012-02-03 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2012-02-01 VERSION: CSSB 103(L&C)
2012-02-01 TRANSMITTED TO (H)
2012-02-01 PASSED Y20 N-
2012-02-01 READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 103(L&C)
2012-02-01 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2012-02-01 L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2012-02-01 READ THE SECOND TIME
2012-02-01 RULES TO CALENDAR 2/1/2012
2012-01-27 FN4: ZERO(LWF)
2012-01-27 FN3: (ADM)
2012-01-27 FN2: (UA)
2012-01-27 NR: STEDMAN, OLSON
2012-01-27 DP: HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS
2012-01-27 FIN RPT CS (L&C) 4DP 2NR
2011-04-08 FN1: ZERO(LWF)
2011-04-08 DP: EGAN, GIESSEL, DAVIS, PASKVAN, MENARD
2011-04-08 L&C RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
2011-03-16 L&C, FIN
2011-03-16 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback