AK SB102 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN5: (EED)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN5: (EED)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to funding for Internet services for school districts; and relating to the Alaska higher education investment fund.
Title
Internet For Schools; Funding
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | FN5: (EED) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-04-16 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-04-16 | House | FIN |
2018-04-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: SB 102 |
2018-04-15 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N1 E1 |
2018-04-15 | Senate | BEGICH MOTION TO ABSTAIN FROM VOTING |
2018-04-15 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-15 | Senate | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2018-04-15 | Senate | FN4: (EED) ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-15 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2018-04-14 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD TO 4/15 CALENDAR UC |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 102 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR |
2018-04-13 | Senate | FN3: (EED)(UPDATED FOR 2018) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-13 | Senate | WILSON MOTION TO ABSTAIN FROM VOTING |
2018-04-13 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FN2: (EED) |
2017-04-14 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2017-04-14 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, MICCICHE |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR |
2017-04-07 | Senate | FN1: (EED) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | NR: BEGICH, STEVENS |
2017-04-07 | Senate | DP: HUGHES, GIESSEL, COGHILL |
2017-04-07 | Senate | EDC RPT 3DP 2NR |
2017-04-03 | Senate | EDC WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2017-04-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |