AK SB101 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing March 12 of each year as Ashley Johnson-Barr Day.
Title
March 12: Ashley Johnson-barr Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/20 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 3/12 CHAPTER 1 SLA 20 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | 2:58 PM 3/9/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-09 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TILTON, SPOHNHOLZ, KOPP, STORY, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON |
2020-03-09 | House | VERSION: SB 101 |
2020-03-09 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2020-03-09 | House | PASSED Y37 E3 |
2020-03-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 101 |
2020-03-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2020-03-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-03-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2020-03-04 | House | DP: VANCE, HOPKINS, SHAW, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS |
2020-03-04 | House | STA RPT 6DP |
2020-03-02 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, LINCOLN, TARR |
2020-03-02 | House | STA |
2020-03-02 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2020-02-28 | Senate | VERSION: SB 101 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N- E4 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, HUGHES, VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WILSON, SHOWER |
2020-02-28 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 101 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2020-02-28 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2020-02-28 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, WILSON, KAWASAKI |
2020-02-26 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP |
2019-03-29 | Senate | KIEHL, BIRCH, COGHILL, GRAY-JACKSON |
2019-03-29 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, BISHOP, MICCICHE, STEVENS, KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, |
2019-03-29 | Senate | STA |
2019-03-29 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |