AK SB100 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/26/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/26/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act naming the Willard E. Dunham Residence Hall.
Title
Naming Willard E. Dunham Residence Hall
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Micciche [R] | Sen. Click Bishop [R] | Sen. Gary Stevens [R] | Sen. Tom Begich [D] |
Rep. Benjamin Carpenter [R] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/26/19 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 9/27 CHAPTER 28 SLA 19 |
2019-10-23 | Senate | 3:11 P.M. 9/9/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-15 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): CARPENTER, TARR, TUCK |
2019-05-15 | House | VERSION: SB 100 |
2019-05-15 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2019-05-15 | House | PASSED Y35 E2 A3 |
2019-05-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 100 |
2019-05-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-15 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2019-05-15 | House | NR: HOPKINS |
2019-05-15 | House | DP: WOOL, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS |
2019-05-15 | House | STA RPT 4DP 1NR |
2019-04-22 | House | STA |
2019-04-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: SB 100 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2019-04-17 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH |
2019-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 100 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | NR: KAWASAKI |
2019-04-12 | Senate | DP: SHOWER, REINBOLD, MICCICHE, COGHILL |
2019-04-12 | Senate | STA RPT 4DP 1NR |
2019-04-10 | Senate | STA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, STEVENS |
2019-03-27 | Senate | STA |
2019-03-27 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |