AK SB100 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to employer contributions to the Public Employees' Retirement System of Alaska; relating to requirements that employers who terminate some or all participation in the Public Employees' Retirement System of Alaska pay termination costs; and making the changes retroactive.
Title
Pers Termination Costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE | |
2012-04-11 | L&C, FIN | |
2012-04-11 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-04-09 | VERSION: CSSB 100(FIN) | |
2012-04-09 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2012-04-09 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2012-04-09 | STEVENS | |
2012-04-09 | COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, DAVIS, THOMAS, STEDMAN, ELLIS, KOOKESH, OLSON, WAGONER, | |
2012-04-09 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 100(FIN) | |
2012-04-09 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-09 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-09 | FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM) | |
2012-04-09 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-09 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | FN2: (ADM) | |
2012-04-04 | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON | |
2012-04-04 | DP: HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, ELLIS | |
2012-04-04 | FIN RPT CS 5DP 2NR SAME TITLE | |
2011-04-06 | FN1: (ADM) | |
2011-04-06 | NR: GIESSEL | |
2011-04-06 | DP: EGAN, DAVIS, PASKVAN, MENARD | |
2011-04-06 | L&C RPT 4DP 1NR | |
2011-03-30 | COSPONSOR(S): MENARD | |
2011-03-14 | L&C, FIN | |
2011-03-14 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |