AK SB10 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extend Suicide Prevention Council

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Suicide Prevention Council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/27/19
2019-07-08SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 6/26 CHAPTER 8 SLA 19
2019-07-08Senate1:30 PM 6/20/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-16HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY
2019-05-15HouseZULKOSKY, MERRICK, FIELDS, DRUMMOND, LINCOLN, SPOHNHOLZ, REVAK, TALERICO, FOSTER
2019-05-15HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JACKSON, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, HOPKINS, LEBON, RASMUSSEN, LEDOUX,
2019-05-15HouseVERSION: SB 10
2019-05-15HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2019-05-15HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-15HousePASSED Y39 E1
2019-05-15HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 10
2019-05-15HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-15HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-15HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2019
2019-05-15HouseFN2: (H.FIN/DHS)
2019-05-15HouseSULLIVAN-LEONARD, ORTIZ, WILSON
2019-05-15HouseDP: JOHNSTON, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, KNOPP, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON,
2019-05-15HouseFIN RPT 10DP
2019-05-03HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, TUCK
2019-05-03HouseFIN
2019-05-03HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-05-02SenateVERSION: SB 10
2019-05-02SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2019-05-02SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-02SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2019-05-02SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 10
2019-05-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-02SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-02SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/02/2019
2019-04-29SenateFN1: (DHS)
2019-04-29SenateDP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON, BISHOP
2019-04-29SenateFIN RPT 7DP
2019-04-24SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BISHOP
2019-04-10SenateCOSPONSOR(S): SHOWER
2019-04-10SenateFN1: (DHS)
2019-04-10SenateDP: SHOWER, MICCICHE, COGHILL, KAWASAKI
2019-04-10SenateSTA RPT 4DP
2019-01-23SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
2019-01-18SenateWILSON, KIEHL, COGHILL, GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, GIESSEL
2019-01-18SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, STEVENS, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, BEGICH, OLSON, BIRCH
2019-01-16SenateSTA, FIN
2019-01-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-01-16SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback