AK SB1 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-16 - WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act making a special appropriation from the earnings reserve account for the payment of permanent fund dividends; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approp: 2016 Pfd Supplemental Payment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Shall the bill be discharged from the Finance Committee? (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-16SenateWITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
2017-04-06SenateMOTION TO DISCHARGE FROM COMMITTEE FLD Y5 N15
2017-02-01SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2017-02-01SenateNR: EGAN, COGHILL
2017-02-01SenateDP: DUNLEAVY, GIESSEL, WILSON
2017-02-01SenateSTA RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
2017-01-18SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, HUGHES
2017-01-18SenateSTA, FIN
2017-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-09SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback