AK SB1 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act prohibiting smoking in certain places; relating to education on the smoking prohibition; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Regulation Of Smoking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): CLAMAN |
2016-04-05 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TALERICO |
2016-04-04 | House | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2016-04-04 | House | JUD, FIN |
2016-04-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-01 | Senate | VERSION: CSSSSB 1(FIN) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | ENGROSSED |
2016-03-30 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-03-30 | Senate | PASSED Y15 N5 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSSB 1(FIN) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-03-30 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-03-30 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-03-30 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN21: ZERO(DOT) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN20: ZERO(DOT) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN19: ZERO(DOT) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN18: ZERO(DOT) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN17: ZERO(DOT) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN16: ZERO(DOT) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN15: ZERO(DHS) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN14: ZERO(DEC) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN13: ZERO(AJS) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN12: ZERO(CED) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN11: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | AM: MACKINNON |
2016-03-23 | Senate | DNP: DUNLEAVY |
2016-03-23 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, BISHOP, HOFFMAN |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 3DP 1DNP 1AM SAME TITLE |
2015-04-15 | Senate | FN10: ZERO(DHS) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | FN9: ZERO(DOT) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | FN8: ZERO(DEC) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(AJS) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(CED) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | FN4: (DOT) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | FN3: (DOT) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | FN1: (DOT) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | NR: STOLTZE, COGHILL, HUGGINS |
2015-04-15 | Senate | DP: WIELECHOWSKI |
2015-04-15 | Senate | STA RPT CS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2015-03-13 | Senate | FN8: ZERO(DEC) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(DHS) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(AJS) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(CED) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | FN4: (DOT) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | FN3: (DOT) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | FN2: (DOT) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | FN1: (DOT) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, KELLY, STOLTZE |
2015-03-13 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, ELLIS |
2015-03-13 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2015-02-27 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI |
2015-02-25 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, ELLIS, GARDNER, HOFFMAN |
2015-02-13 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, BISHOP, STEVENS, MEYER |
2015-02-06 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE |
2015-01-30 | Senate | HSS, STA, FIN |
2015-01-30 | Senate | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS |
2015-01-21 | Senate | HSS, STA, FIN |
2015-01-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-01-21 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15 |
Subjects
Airports
Boats & Boating
Buildings
Business
Civil Procedure
Courts
Crimes
Day Care
Education
Employment
Food
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Housing
Landlord & Tenant
Marine Facilities
Marine Highway
Medical Care
Motor Vehicles
Nonprofit Organizations
Nursing Homes
Parks & Recreation
Pioneers' Homes
Privacy
Property
Public Accommodations
Public Corporations
Public Employees
Public Land
Residential Care
Rights
Sales
Schools
Tobacco
Transportation
Universities
Vessels
Youth Centers
Boats & Boating
Buildings
Business
Civil Procedure
Courts
Crimes
Day Care
Education
Employment
Food
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Housing
Landlord & Tenant
Marine Facilities
Marine Highway
Medical Care
Motor Vehicles
Nonprofit Organizations
Nursing Homes
Parks & Recreation
Pioneers' Homes
Privacy
Property
Public Accommodations
Public Corporations
Public Employees
Public Land
Residential Care
Rights
Sales
Schools
Tobacco
Transportation
Universities
Vessels
Youth Centers