AK HR9 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/17 HOUSE RESOLVE 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/17 HOUSE RESOLVE 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homeport Icebreakers In Ak
Title
Homeport Icebreakers In Ak
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | House | PERMANENTLY FILED 11/17 HOUSE RESOLVE 9 |
2021-08-16 | House | 2:51 P.M. 7/15/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | House | JOSEPHSON, TILTON, RAUSCHER, STORY |
2021-05-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, KAUFMAN, KURKA, SCHRAGE, HANNAN, MCCARTY, CRONK, |
2021-05-19 | House | VERSION: HR 9 AM |
2021-05-19 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2021-05-19 | House | AM NO 4 ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-19 | House | AM NO 3 ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-19 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-19 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2021-05-19 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-19 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021 |
2021-05-19 | House | LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1 |
2021-05-19 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) |
2021-05-19 | House | AM: RAUSCHER |
2021-05-19 | House | DP: STORY, NELSON, TARR, CLAMAN, TUCK |
2021-05-19 | House | MLV RPT 5DP 1AM |
2021-05-18 | House | MLV |
2021-05-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boats & Boating
Economic Development
Economy
Fish & Game (fish)
International Relations
Marine Facilities
Military
Oil & Gas
Resources
Vessels
Water
Economic Development
Economy
Fish & Game (fish)
International Relations
Marine Facilities
Military
Oil & Gas
Resources
Vessels
Water